start: 29/09/2024 07:01:08.162
end: 29/09/2024 07:01:08.193
31ms
Former Governor-Generals
Governor
Sir John Warburtorn Paul, GCMG, OBE, MC served as the last Royal Governor and as the first Governor-General of The Bahamas - 1972-1973
Governors-General
|
Sir Milo Boughton Butler, GCMG, GCVO:
August 1st, 1973 - January 22nd, 1979
|
|
Sir Gerald Christopher Cash, GCMG, GCVO, OBE, JP:
September 24th, 1979 - June 25th, 1988 (acted September 2nd, 1976 - September 23rd, 1979
|
|
Sir Henry Milton Taylor, Kt., JP:
March 1st, 1991 - January 1st, 1992 (acted June 26th, 1988 - February 29th, 1991)
|
|
Sir Clifford Darling, GCVO, JP:
January 2nd, 1992 - January 2nd, 1995
|
|
Sir Orville Turnquest, GCMG, QC, JP. LL.B:
January 3rd, 1995 - November 12th, 2001
|
|
Dame Ivy L. Dumont, DCMG, JP:
January 1st, 2002 - November 30th, 2005 (acted November 13th, 2001 - December 31st, 2001)
|
|
His Excellency the Honourable Arthur D. Hanna:
February 1st, 2006 - April 14th, 2010
|
|
Sir Arthur Foulkes, GCMG:
April 14th, 2010 - July 8th, 2014
|
|
Her Excellency Dame Marguerite Pindling, GCMG:
July 8th, 2014 to June 28th, 2019
|
mof_content/internet/Office of the Governor-General/Government/About Us/Former Governor-Generals/Former Governor-Generals
Former Governor-Generals
start: 29/09/2024 07:01:08.222
end: 29/09/2024 07:01:08.360
138ms
mof_content/internet/Office of the Governor-General/Home
Home
start: 29/09/2024 07:01:08.360
end: 29/09/2024 07:01:08.361
1ms
mof_content/internet/Office of the Governor-General/Government/About Us/Former Governor-Generals/Former Governor-Generals
Former Governor-Generals
start: 29/09/2024 07:01:08.361
end: 29/09/2024 07:01:08.363
2ms